Patlas, Michael (CPSO#: 78034)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Feb 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 14 Feb 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The Hebrew University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Radiology
HHS - Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 529-3732
Fax: (905) 527-5761
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael Patlas Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 28 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Patlas ( CPSO# 78034 )

Business Address:
Department of Radiology
HHS - Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 529-3732

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 23 Oct 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 15 Feb 2004
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Feb 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Feb 2004
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 15 Feb 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 15 Feb 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Dec 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Feb 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Feb 2011

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 14 Feb 2011 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Michael Patlas may practice medicine independently in Diagnostic Radiology,
            only.