Patodia, Krishan Kumar (CPSO#: 65502)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:Queen's University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 211
1060 Speers Road
Oakville ON  L6L 2X4
Phone: (905) 842-8163
Fax: (905) 842-9059
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Krishan Kumar Patodia Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 10 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Patodia ( CPSO# 65502 )

Business Address:
Suite 211
1060 Speers Road
Oakville ON  L6L 2X4
Phone Number: (905) 842-8163

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KRISHAN KUMAR PATODIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATODIA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1993