Patodia, Murari Lal (CPSO#: 59333)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jul 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1298 Exmouth Street
Sarnia ON  N7S 1W6
Phone: (519) 336-4448
Fax: (519) 336-6981
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Murari L. Patodia Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 13 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Patodia ( CPSO# 59333 )

Business Address:
1298 Exmouth Street
Sarnia ON  N7S 1W6
Phone Number: (519) 336-4448

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bluewater Health Sarnia
Bluewater Health,Charlotte Eleanor Englehart Site Petrolia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 25 Oct 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MURARI LAL PATODIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATODIA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1988 to 14 Jun 1989
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 1995 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Dec 1995
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1989