Patodia, Shaila (CPSO#: 64966)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: Kaloni, Shaila (used until: 22 Nov 2011 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 211
1060 Speers Road
Oakville ON  L6L 2X4
Phone: (905) 337-1107
Fax: (905) 337-7361
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 04 Nov 1997 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 21 Nov 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHAILA PATODIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATODIA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1993