Paton, Katherine Elaine (CPSO#: 59972)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jan 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jan 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2184 West Broadway
Suite 210
Vancouver BC  V6K 2E1
Phone: (604) 732-8141
Fax: (604) 732-7997
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

103-40147 Glenalder Place
Squamish BC  V8B 0G2
Canada
Phone: (604) 892-3007
Fax: (604) 732-7997
County: 
Electoral District: 

Section L
2550 Willow Street
Vancouver BC  V5Z 3N9
Canada
Phone: (604) 875-5201
Fax: (604) 875-5679
County: 
Electoral District: 

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 24 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KATHERINE ELAINE PATON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 1990