Patrick, David Gordon (CPSO#: 82519)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Aug 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Aug 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Homewood Health Centre
Addiction Division150 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 6K9
Phone: (519) 824-1010 Ext. 2128
Fax: (519) 767-3536
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Patrick Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 01 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Patrick ( CPSO# 82519 )

Business Address:
Homewood Health Centre
Addiction Division
150 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 6K9
Phone Number: (519) 824-1010

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Homewood Health Centre Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID GORDON PATRICK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATRICK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2007
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 05 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2010