Patrick, David Michael (CPSO#: 57075)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 11 Aug 1989

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Ottawa, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 05 Sep 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Aug 1989