Patriquin, Glenn Matthew (CPSO#: 104706)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 07 Mar 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Mar 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Dalhousie University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 27 Aug 2014 to 17 Sep 2014
Elective Trainee - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 08 Feb 2017 to 07 Mar 2017
Elective Trainee - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Sep 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Feb 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Mar 2017