Patriquin, Maria Jessica (CPSO#: 70031)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jul 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1999 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 1998
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2000