Patroi, Anca (CPSO#: 87293)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Jan 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jan 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Romanian

Education:University of Bucharest, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Milton Family Care Centre
820 Main Street East
Milton ON  L9T 0J4
Phone: (905) 864-9898
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Anca Patroi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 21 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Patroi ( CPSO# 87293 )

Business Address:
Milton Family Care Centre
820 Main Street East
Milton ON  L9T 0J4
Phone Number: (905) 864-9898

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Dec 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANCA PATROI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATROI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 23 Sep 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 29 Sep 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jan 2011