Patry, Mark Gerard (CPSO#: 23525)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 05 May 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 May 2000

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French, Portuguese, Spanish

Education:University of Ottawa, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 01 Jan 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Dec 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 May 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Feb 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 May 2000

Concerns

Source: Discipline Committee
Active Date: October 16, 2000
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Dr. Mark Gerard Patry signed an agreement with the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (CPSO) on October 16, 2000, that the following shall appear on the public register of the CPSO:

Dr. Patry resigned from practice, and undertook not to reapply for a licence in Ontario or any other jurisdiction, and he did so in light of pending allegations of incompetence referred to the Discipline Committee of the CPSO.

On October 18, 2000, the allegations against Dr. Mark Gerard Patry were withdrawn.