Patterson, Andrew James (CPSO#: 80778)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Aug 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Aug 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
OATC Ottawa West
1318 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7K8
Phone: 613-627-0856
Fax: 613-715-9174
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Almonte General Hospital
75 Spring Street
Almonte ON  K0A 1A0
Canada
Phone: 613-256-2500
Fax: 613-256-8588
County: County of Lanark
Electoral District: 07

OATC Ottawa
401 Somerset Street, W
Ottawa, ON
Ottawa ON  K2P 0K1
Canada
Phone: 613-233-1114
Fax: 613-233-1141
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Andrew Patterson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 15 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Patterson ( CPSO# 80778 )

Business Address:
75 Spring Street
Almonte ON  K0A 1A0
Phone Number: (613) 256-2500

Business Address:
221 Nelson Street
Ottawa ON  K1N 1C7
Phone Number: (613) 789-8941

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Almonte General Hospital Almonte

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 28 Aug 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW JAMES PATTERSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATTERSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 25 Sep 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 26 Sep 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 28 Aug 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Aug 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2006