Patterson, David William (CPSO#: 82598)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 20 Sep 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 20 Sep 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Dec 2010 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Sep 2016

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: February 16, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Criminal Charges:

Effective May 29, 2015, where a member has been charged with an offence under the Criminal Code of Canada or the Ontario Health Insurance Act and the charge is outstanding and is known to the College, the College By-laws require certain information about the charge to be posted on the register.

The following are outstanding charges against this member, as known to the College, together with the corresponding information:

It is alleged that David William Patterson:

(1) On or about January 15, 2014, in Montréal, district of Montréal, did commit a sexual assault on XX, committing thereby the offence punishable on summary conviction provided by section 271(1)(b) of the Criminal Code of Canada; and

(2) On or about January 22, 2014, in Montréal, district of Montréal, did commit a sexual assault on XX, committing thereby the offence punishable on summary conviction provided by section 271(1)(b) of the Criminal Code of Canada


Date of charges: 5 August 2014
Place of charges: Montréal, Québec
Service de police de la ville de Montréal