Patterson, George Alexander (CPSO#: 30951)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 09 Aug 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Illinois
USA - Missouri

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 13 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist
Thoracic Surgery Effective: 30 Nov 1981 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 24 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Aug 2016