Patterson, Janet Alice (CPSO#: 51657)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Jan 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jan 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1 Young Street
Suite 401
Hamilton ON  L8N 1T8
Phone: (905) 387-3561
Fax: (905) 387-0398
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J. A. Patterson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 29 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Patterson ( CPSO# 51657 )

Business Address:
50 Charlton Avenue West
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-4941

Business Address:
401 - 1 Young Street
Hamilton ON  L8N 1T8
Phone Number: (905) 387-3561

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 07 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JANET ALICE PATTERSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATTERSON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Other - Rotating Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jan 1988