Patterson, Steven John (CPSO#: 52675)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 19 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1983 to 14 Jun 1984
Resident 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 31 Dec 1991
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Oct 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 1997
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2001