Pau, Wilson Shu Cheng (CPSO#: 88076)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 20 Jan 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 20 Jan 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Universiti Sains Malaysia, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 21 Jan 2008 to 13 Apr 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 14 Apr 2008 to 20 Jan 2009
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 06 Feb 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Apr 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Jan 2009