Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Paul, James Edward (CPSO#: 67752)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton Health Sciences Corp
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 527-4322
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. James Paul Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 26 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Paul ( CPSO# 67752 )

Business Address:
Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
Juravinski General Hospital
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
McMaster University Medical
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4L8
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES EDWARD PAUL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAUL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999