Paul, Narinder Singh (CPSO#: 70232)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jul 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:University of Southampton, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Chair-Chief Medical Imaging
LHSC University Hospital
Rm C2-226
339 Windermere Rd
London ON  N6A 5A6
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Electoral District: 02
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Department of Medical Imaging
Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Canada
Phone: (416) 340-4800 Ext. 3422
Fax: (416) 340-3900
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Department of Medical Imaging
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
610 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Canada
Phone: (416) 340-4800 Ext. 3422
Fax: (416) 340-3900
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Department of Medical Imaging
Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Canada
Phone: (416) 340-4800
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Department of Medical Imaging
76 Grenville Street
Toronto
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Canada
Phone: (416) 340-4800
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: White Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 11 2017


Corporation Name: Narinder S. Paul Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 31 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Paul ( CPSO# 70232 )

Business Address:
Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Avenue
Toronto ON  M5S 1B1
Phone Number: (416) 323-6400

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 596-4200

Business Address:
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-2581

Business Address:
UHN Princess Margaret Hospital
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5T 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-4501

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone Number: (416) 340-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 31 May 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NARINDER SINGH PAUL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAUL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2000 to 30 Sep 2001
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Nov 2000
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2001
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Sep 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Oct 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Oct 2001
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 03 Oct 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2004