Paul, Partha Pratim (CPSO#: 84253)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
215 Fanshawe Park Rd. West
2nd Floor
London ON  N6G 5A9
Phone: (519) 645-2444
Fax: (519) 645-2545
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Paul and Pamula Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 30 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Pamula ( CPSO# 80693 )
Dr. P. Paul ( CPSO# 84253 )

Business Address:
215 Fanshawe Park Road West
2nd Floor
London ON  N6G 5A9
Phone Number: (519) 645-2444

Business Address:
Suite 300
140 Oxford Street East
London ON  N6A 5R9
Phone Number: (519) 850-3234

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 26 Sep 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PARTHA PRATIM PAUL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAUL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010