Paul, Ryan Augustine (CPSO#: 105159)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Aug 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Health Care
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone: (519) 646-6000
Electoral District: 02

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RYAN AUGUSTINE PAUL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAUL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 18 Nov 2014 to 14 Dec 2014
Elective Trainee - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 15 Dec 2014 to 11 Jan 2015
Elective Trainee - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2016 to 31 Jul 2017
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Nov 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jan 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 2016