Paul, Terri Louise (CPSO#: 59226)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Mar 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Mar 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Health Care
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone: (519) 646-6245
Fax: (519) 646-6067
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Terri L. Paul Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 21 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Paul ( CPSO# 59226 )

Business Address:
St Joseph's Health Care
Suite B5-118
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (416) 646-6245

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 10 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 02 Sep 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TERRI LOUISE PAUL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAUL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 1988