Paul, William Morris (CPSO#: 12385)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1995

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1947

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 01 Jan 1953 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 1947
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Apr 1963
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 1965
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1995