Paulin, Frederic Laurent (CPSO#: 82268)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jul 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 18 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 04 Apr 2005 to 01 May 2005
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Apr 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 May 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2009