Paulovic, Robert Peter (CPSO#: 70125)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Taunton Health Centre
1290 Keith Ross Drive
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K4
Phone: (905) 721-4328
Fax: (905) 721-6691
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

117 KING STREET EAST
Oshawa ON  L1H 1B9
Canada
Phone: (905) 721-8551
Fax: (905) 721-6691
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. P. Paulovic Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 04 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Paulovic ( CPSO# 70125 )

Business Address:
117 King Street East
Oshawa ON  L1H 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 723-8551

Business Address:
Taunton Health Centre
1290 Keith Ross Court
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K4
Phone Number: (905) 723-8551

Business Address:
1450 Highway #2
Courtice ON  L1E 3C4
Phone Number: (905) 723-8551

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT PETER PAULOVIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAULOVIC is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1998