Paupst, Millie Mary Margaret (CPSO#: 62697)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jun 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hosptial
4001 Leslie Street
805-J
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6633
Fax: (416) 756-6424
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 27 Apr 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MILLIE MARY MARGARET PAUPST may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAUPST is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1990 to 17 Jun 1991
Other - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 11 Sep 2004
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Oct 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2003
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 22 Oct 2004
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2005