Pavlosky, William Frank (CPSO#: 31978)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Jun 1979

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Sep 1980

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Health Centre
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone: (519) 646-6100 Ext. 64136
Fax: (519) 646-6135
Electoral District: 02
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Chatham Kent Health Alliance
12 Emma Street
Chatham ON  N7L 1A6
Canada
Phone: (519) 352-6400
County: County of Kent
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: William Pavlosky Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 09 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Pavlosky ( CPSO# 31978 )

Business Address:
St Joseph's Health Centre
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6100

Business Address:
Chatham Kent Health Alliance
12 Emma Street
Chatham ON  N7L 1A6
Phone Number: (519) 352-6400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Alexandra Hospital Ingersoll
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital Goderich
Chatham Public General Hospital Society Chatham
Four Counties Health Services,Newbury Newbury
Hanover and District Hospital Hanover
Kincardine and District Site,South Bruce Grey Health Kincardine
London Health Sciences Centre South Street Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Chesley Site Chesley
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Durham-Memorial Site Durham
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Walkerton Site Walkerton
South Huron Hospital Exeter
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 22 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist
Nuclear Medicine Effective: 01 Dec 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WILLIAM FRANK PAVLOSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAVLOSKY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 1980