Pavone, Elio (CPSO#: 59728)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jul 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Oshawa Clinic
1300 Keith Ross Drive
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K4
Phone: (905) 723-8551 Ext. 5312
Fax: (905) 721-6628
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Elio Pavone Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 23 2015


Corporation Name: Elio Pavone Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 25 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Pavone ( CPSO# 59728 )

Business Address:
117 King Street East
Oshawa ON  L1H 1B9
Phone Number: (905) 723-8551

Business Address:
Oshawa Clinic
1300 Keith Ross Drive
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K4
Phone Number: (905) 723-8551

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 19 Nov 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELIO PAVONE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAVONE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Jun 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1989