Pawelec - Brzychczy, Anna (CPSO#: 78766)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jan 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jan 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Academy of Medicine, Wroclaw, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
60 Chesley Avenue
London ON  N5Z 2C1
Phone: (519) 433-8424
Fax: (519) 433-2244
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Pawelec-Brzychczy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 28 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Pawelec - Brzychczy ( CPSO# 78766 )

Business Address:
60 Chesley Avenue
London ON  N5Z 2C1
Phone Number: (519) 433-8424

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNA PAWELEC - BRZYCHCZY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAWELEC - BRZYCHCZY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 06 Jan 2003 to 05 Jan 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 06 Jan 2004 to 05 Jan 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 06 Jan 2005 to 13 Feb 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2005