Pawlina, Alexandra Sophie (CPSO#: 111799)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 May 2017

Expiry Date:  14 May 2020

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 15 May 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Jagiellonian University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2291 Kipling Avenue
Etobicoke ON  M9W 4L6
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Pawlina Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 15 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Pawlina ( CPSO# 111799)

Business Address:
2291 Kipling Avenue
Etobicoke ON  M9W 4L6
Phone Number: (416) 741-4545

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 2017 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 May 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 May 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 14 May 2020

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 15 May 2017 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Alexandra Sophie Pawlina may practise family medicine at 2291 Kipling
                  Avenue  in  Etobicoke,  Ontario, while under supervision coordinated by a
                  supervisor acceptable to the College.

            2.    The certificate of registration  automatically  expires  three years from
                  the date of issuance.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires upon  the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate  with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the  supervisor notifies the College of any concerns regarding  Dr.
                        Pawlina's  knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide
                        the required  reports  to  the  College  by  the due date or if the
                        reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  supervisor  is  no  longer  able  or  willing to  continue  to
                        supervise Dr. Pawlina's practice.
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on May 15, 2017, and will  expire on or before
                  May 14, 2020, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.