Paxton, Richard Eldon (CPSO#: 55815)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 11 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 11 Jul 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1987 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Nov 1988 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Jul 1996