Payne, Donald Ernest (CPSO#: 20887)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 05 Dec 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Dec 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients seeking to obtain a copy of their medical record should contact DocuDavit Solutions at: 1-888-781-9083.
Date Received: 01 Dec 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 01 Jan 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1963
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Dec 2017