Payne, Robert Paul (CPSO#: 85028)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jan 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jan 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Calgary, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
16700 Bayview Avenue
Suite 216
Newmarket ON  L3X 1W1
Phone: (905) 853-7468 Ext. 0
Fax: (905) 836-9038
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT PAUL PAYNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAYNE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 2014