Payton, Diane Josephine (CPSO#: 56019)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Queensland, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 Dec 2001
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2001