Payton, Keith Bramwell (CPSO#: 31017)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1978

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jan 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 409
450 Central Avenue
London ON  N6B 2E8
Phone: (519) 936-0286
Fax: (519) 936-0395
Electoral District: 02
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Bluewater Health
89 Norman Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Canada
Phone: (519) 464-4400
Fax: (519) 936-0395
County: County of Lambton
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Keith Payton Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 25 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Payton ( CPSO# 31017 )

Business Address:
Suite 409
450 Central Avenue
London ON  N6B 2E8
Phone Number: (519) 936-0286

Business Address:
Bluewater Health
89 Norman Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Phone Number: (519) 464-4400

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bluewater Health Sarnia
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 24 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Immunology Effective: 03 Dec 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KEITH BRAMWELL PAYTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAYTON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 1984