Peacock, Edith Mabel (CPSO#: 67516)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jun 1994

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sherwood Medical Centre
15 Brackley Point Road
Charlottetown PE  C1A 6Y1
Phone: (902) 367-4025
Fax: (902) 367-4035

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Prince Edward Island

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EDITH MABEL PEACOCK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PEACOCK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Oct 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Dec 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1994