Pearce, Andrew Gordon (CPSO#: 88313)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North East Cancer Centre
Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 522-6237
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Andrew Pearce Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 20 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Pearce ( CPSO# 88313 )

Business Address:
Sudbury Regional Hospital
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 522-6237


Corporation Name: Pearce, Andronowski and Want Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 6 2015


Corporation Name: Want and Carlson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 4 2016

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW GORDON PEARCE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PEARCE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 02 Jun 2008 to 27 Jun 2008
Elective Trainee - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009