Pearce, Derek Joseph (CPSO#: 51366)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1984 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Nov 1989 CFPC Specialist
FCFP - Family Medicine Effective: 01 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1982 to 15 Jun 1983
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Mar 2007
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2011