Pearce, Mark Allan (CPSO#: 77834)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ctre for Addiction & Mental Health
Unit 3-4
1001 Queen Street West
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone: (416) 535-8501 Ext. 32835
Fax: (888) 552-6166
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Ontario Shores Centre for
Mental Health Sciences
700 Gordon Street
Whitby ON  L1N 5S9
Canada
Phone: (905) 668-5881 Ext. 6893
Fax: (888) 552-6166
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

94 Laird Dr.
Toronto ON  M4G 3V2
Canada
Phone: (416) 535-8501 Ext. 32835
Fax: (888) 552-6166
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mark Pearce Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 05 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Pearce ( CPSO# 77834 )

Business Address:
Centre for Addiction and Mental Health
Unit 3 - 4
1001 Queen Street West
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone Number: (416) 535-8501

Business Address:
700 Gordon Street
Suite 7-2
Whitby ON  L1N 5S9
Phone Number: (905) 668-5881

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto
Centre of Addiction & Mental Health,- College Street Site Toronto
Ontario Shores Centre for Mental Health Sciences Whitby

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Forensic Psychiatry Effective: 26 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARK ALLAN PEARCE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PEARCE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2007