Pearce, Michelle Marie (CPSO#: 63832)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Possibilities Clinic
#305 - 55 Eglinton Ave E.
Toronto ON  M4P 1G8
Phone: (416) 482-5558
Fax: (416) 482-8999
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry Effective: 23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHELLE MARIE PEARCE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PEARCE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1992