Pearce, Neil Joseph (CPSO#: 72153)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 05 Oct 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Oct 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiology Effective: 11 Sep 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jun 1998 to 27 Jun 1998
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 10 Sep 2001 to 05 Oct 2001
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Oct 2001