Pearce, Ronald K B (CPSO#: 55498)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 07 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Jul 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, German

Education:University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 27 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Feb 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Jul 1997