Pearl, Rachel Jane (CPSO#: 71440)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 2001

Summary

Former Name: Alexander, Rachel Jane (used until: 11 Jul 1999 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-6593
Fax: (905) 494-6594
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Division of Nephrology
The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Canada
Phone: (416) 813-7411
Fax: (416) 813-7970
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Division of Nephrology
The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Canada
Phone: (416) 813-7411
Fax: (416) 813-7970
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Finchgate Medical Centre
Suite 102
40 Finchgate Boulevard
Brampton ON  L6T 3J1
Canada
Phone: (905) 791-6444
Fax: (905) 791-7333
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Peel Memorial Centre
20 Lynch Street
Brampton ON  L6W 2Z8
Canada
Phone: 9058632552
Fax: 9058632468
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Finchgate Medical Centre
Suite 102
40 Finchgate Boulevard
Brampton ON  L6T 3J1
Canada
Phone: (905) 791-6444
Fax: (905) 791-7333
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rachel Pearl Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 15 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Pearl ( CPSO# 71440 )

Business Address:
Finchgate Medical Centre
102 - 40 Finchgate Boulevard
Brampton ON  L6T 3J1
Phone Number: (905) 791-6444

Business Address:
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-6593

Business Address:
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-7654

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 15 Oct 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RACHEL JANE PEARL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PEARL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 Jul 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 15 Oct 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2001