Pearl, Richard Hugh (CPSO#: 58738)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Nov 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Nov 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Wright State University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 09 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 5 - Paediatric Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 5 - Paediatric Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 1994 to 23 Feb 1995
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Feb 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Feb 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 1997