Pearl, Stephen Kenneth (CPSO#: 51424)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 10 Jun 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 10 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1983
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 05 Dec 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Jun 2004