Pearlman, Jennifer Beth (CPSO#: 80007)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Feb 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1650 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4T 2A2
Phone: (416) 644-1112
Fax: (416) 479-0011
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Mount Sinai Hospital
700 University Ave, 8th floor
Toronto
Toronto ON  M5G 1Z5
Canada
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 4621
Fax: (416) 586-5941
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jennifer Pearlman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 17 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Pearlman ( CPSO# 80007 )

Business Address:
101 - 1650 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4T 2A2
Phone Number: (416) 644-1112

Medical Records Location

Address: DocuDavit Solutions 28 Eugene Street Toronto, Ontario M6B 3Z4 Tel: (416) 781-9083 Toll Free: 1-888-781-9083 Fax: 1-866-297-9338 Website: http://www.docudavit.com
Date Received: 03 Jun 2013

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 21 Feb 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNIFER BETH PEARLMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PEARLMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Dec 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 26 Feb 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Feb 2006