Pearsall, Donald Frederick (CPSO#: 33686)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 28 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 31 Dec 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1981 to 15 Jun 1982
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 1992 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 31 Dec 1992
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 1993 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 31 Dec 1993
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 1994 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 31 Dec 1994
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Jul 2015