Pearse, Bryan Frederick (CPSO#: 28206)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Oct 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Oct 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bryan Pearse Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 13 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 14 Jun 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Oct 2013