Pearson, Blake Terrance (CPSO#: 105021)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Sep 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 29 Sep 2014

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Rapids Family Health Team
1150 Pontiac Drive
Sarnia ON  N7S 3A7
Phone: (519) 339-8949
Electoral District: 01
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

481 London Road
Sarnia ON  N7T 4X3
Canada
County: County of Lambton
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Blake T. Pearson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 03 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Pearson ( CPSO# 105021)

Business Address:
Family Health Team
Suite 4
1150 Pontiac Drive
Sarnia ON  N7S 3A7
Phone Number: (519) 339-8949

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Sep 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 28 Mar 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 28 Sep 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Apr 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 28 Sep 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 07 Apr 2016 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Blake  Terrance  Pearson  may  practise  medicine  independently in family
            medicine.