Peat, Mary Isobel (CPSO#: 51370)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Dec 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Westmount Specialty Clinic
723 Rymal Road West
Hamilton ON  L9B 2W2
Phone: (905) 627-9397
Fax: (905) 574-2283
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 05 Dec 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARY ISOBEL PEAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PEAT is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Dec 1985